HI SB1351 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1351

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-23 at 04:30pm in Conference Room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the infant and early childhood mental health program within the department of health to provide and coordinate mental health services for children from birth up to age five. Appropriates funds for the establishment of the program, including for an unspecified number of permanent full-time equivalent (FTE) positions. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Infant And Early Childhood Mental Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-28HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-23 at 04:30pm in Conference Room 309.
2023-04-27SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 329.
2023-04-26SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-23 4:40PM; Conference Room 329.
2023-04-24SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
2023-04-21HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Belatti, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; La Chica, Garcia.
2023-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915).
2023-04-20SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Aquino.
2023-04-13HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
2023-04-13SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2023-04-13SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 782).
2023-04-11HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-04-06HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23.
2023-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2098) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-04-03HouseThe committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-03-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-03-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-24HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
2023-03-24HouseReported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1485) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2023-03-21HouseThe committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2023-03-21HouseThe committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2023-03-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-09HouseReferred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 419) in amended form (SD 2).
2023-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 981) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2023-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2023-02-17SenateReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2023-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
2023-01-30SenateReferred to HHS, WAM.
2023-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1351 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-23 at 04:30pm in Conference Room 309.
HB1053 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback