HI SB1351 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1351
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of public accountability to assume oversight and administrative responsibility for the office of the auditor, office of the ombudsman, office of information practices, Hawaii state ethics commission, and campaign spending commission. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To State Government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1351 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Auditor
Campaign Spending Commission
Office of Public Accountability
OIP
Ombudsman
State Ethics Commission
Auditor
Campaign Spending Commission
Office of Public Accountability
OIP
Ombudsman
State Ethics Commission
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1351&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1351_.HTM |