HI SB1344 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1344
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture, in coordination with the office of planning, to prepare and periodically update the state agriculture functional plan to include other agricultural economic updates, including seafood sustainability, that expand the State's priority on food by including wild seafood as a viable food source. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Food Sustainability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 417) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 893) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 467) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1346 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1344 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
SB1344 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).