HI SB1343 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1343
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes acreage restrictions on leases of Hawaiian home lands for agricultural purposes. Provides that the availability of the foregoing leases shall be subject to the availability of suitable tracts of land. Specifies that the foregoing leases may be for for-profit or non-profit purposes. Effective date is May 6, 2037. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 416) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 194) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1344 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1343 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB1343 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22