HI SB1342 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 3:46PM; CR 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes under the offense of promoting gambling in the first degree the act of engaging in activities in which a persons receives or entertains other persons as guests with the intent of advancing gambling activity on real property. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Illegal Gambling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 3:46PM; CR 325.
2021-04-20SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 3:46PM; CR 325.
2021-04-19SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 4:05PM; CR 325.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2021-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 4:00PM; CR 325.
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nakashima, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Fevella.
2021-04-13HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2021-04-13SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-09SenateDeferred One Day 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 438).
2021-04-08HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1699), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1478), recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-24HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2021-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:30PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1060) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-18HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
2021-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-18-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-15HouseRe-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 25
2021-03-11HouseReferred to CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 415) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-03-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 760) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 9:16AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to JDC.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback