HI SB1334 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1334
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to WAL, HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to WAL, HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the raising of the building height limit for two of the six parcels owned by the office of Hawaiian affairs in the Kakaako Makai area to four hundred feet. Lifts the current restriction against residential development in Kakaako Makai to allow residential development by the office of Hawaiian affairs or by third parties to which the office of Hawaiian affairs conveys the parcels. Requires the office of Hawaiian affairs and any developer to provide written notice to any tenant or resident of potential aircraft related nuisances before entering into a lease, and to assess and propose mitigation efforts to address aircraft related nuisances in development plans and proposals. Effective 5/6/2137. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to WAL, HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 412) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Lee. Noes, 6 (Senator(s) Ihara, Kim, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Lee, Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Misalucha, Riviere; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Moriwaki; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM/WTL will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee on JDC/WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-03-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/HOU, JDC/WAM/WTL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM, with Senator Acasio voting "Aye, with reservations" and Senators Kim, Moriwaki and Riviere voting "No". |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HWN/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 429) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Moriwaki; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/HOU, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HOU, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1334 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to WAL, HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
HB1267 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1267 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Kakaako Makai
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Residential Development
Kakaako Makai
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Residential Development