HI SB1332 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1332

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the allowable number of production centers and retail dispensing locations per dispensary license. Authorizes the department of health to allow a licensed dispensary to purchase medical cannabis or manufactured cannabis products from another licensed dispensary on the same island to ensure ongoing qualified patient access. Authorizes the collection and laboratory testing of samples of cannabis and manufactured cannabis as part of production center and dispensary inspections. Authorizes the department of health to establish manufacturing and product stability standards of manufactured cannabis products. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 501) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Misalucha ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 9:00AM; 229 & Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to HTH/CPN, JDC.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB477 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1332 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback