HI SB1330 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1330
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
During a state of emergency or local state of emergency, provides parameters for delegation of powers and scope and duration of suspension of laws. Provides an advise and consent process for an emergency proclamation to extend beyond one hundred twenty days. Provides a legislative means for an emergency proclamation to be terminated.
Title
Relating To Emergency Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1330 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
HB1128 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1128 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Advise and Consent
Emergency Management
Local State of Emergency
Powers
Proclamation
Scope and Duration
State of Emergency
Emergency Management
Local State of Emergency
Powers
Proclamation
Scope and Duration
State of Emergency
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1330&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1330_.HTM |