HI SB1328 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the DOD for the civil air patrol.
Title
Department of Defense; Civil Air Patrol; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 229) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1136 (Same As) 2013-06-18 - Act 122, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222).