HI SB1325 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1325
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Aligns Hawaii's money transmitters law with the provisions of the Model Money Transmitters Modernization Act, thereby enabling Hawaii to work within a network of states to license, supervise, and examine transglobal money transmission companies as a multi-state system. Enables timely, coordinated, and efficient regulation of money transmission companies to achieve financial stability and economic growth, while providing consumer protection. Allows the State to share resources, data, and technology tools with other states to create a stronger multi-state system of financial regulation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Money Transmitters Modernization Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 413) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 818) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Division of Financial Institutions
Money Transmission
Money Transmitter
Permissible Investments
Tangible Net Worth
Money Transmission
Money Transmitter
Permissible Investments
Tangible Net Worth