HI SB1321 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1321
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants forty-year gaming license for a single integrated resort property on Hawaiian home lands designated for commercial use on the island of Oahu excluding lands west of Ko Olina. Establishes Hawaii Gaming Commission. Imposes wagering tax on gross gaming revenue. Creates State Gaming Fund. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Gaming.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-18-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-16-21 1:01PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1321 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
HB359 (Same As) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB359 (Same As) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1321&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1321_.HTM |