HI SB1321 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes acceptable forms of identification for merchants if required for purchases or returns. Requires merchants to post their identification policies, if any, and list acceptable forms of identification. Adds government-issued work identification to "proper identification" requirement when a practitioner or pharmacist dispenses a controlled substance to any individual not known to the practitioner or pharmacist.
Title
Identification; Merchants; Policy; Controlled Substances
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPN. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1321&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB1321_.HTM |