HI SB1320 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1320

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates general funds to various programs due to anticipated operating shortfalls due to the limited ability for departments to transfer funds between programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Funding Adjustments For State Programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30SenateReferred to WAM.
2023-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1320 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAM.
HB1022 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - Act 037, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback