HI SB1318 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that claimants seeking to quiet title of kuleana land and original land titles that are land commission awards with a royal patent of confirmation which are based on claims to a right to the land before 1848 shall own more than fifty per cent of the land. Requires that the plaintiff bear the costs associated with resolving quiet title disputes. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Kuleana Lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-12SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 198) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to HWN, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback