HI SB1318 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows DLNR to establish an interim construction moratorium along Kailua Beach to protect development from coastal hazards, to conserve and protect beaches, to preserve recreational uses of coastal resources, and to minimize future impacts to the coastal ecosystem. (SB1318 HD1)
Title
Coastal Zone Management; State Planning; Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused (6). | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-23 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, C. Lee, Luke, Morita, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-23-09 9:30 in conference room 325. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 03-16-09 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 374) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 6 (Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Tokuda, Tsutsui). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) One Day Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Kidani, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Hooser ; 1 No(es): Tokuda; and 1 Excused: Kokubun. | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Fukunaga, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Tokuda; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 2:45pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |