HI SB1315 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/WLA/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/WLA/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires labeling of foods that have been genetically engineered. Provides a penalty for violations and authorizes private civil enforcement of the Act.
Title
Labeling of Genetically Engineered Foods; Private Civil Enforcement
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/WLA/JDL, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to CPN/HTH/AGL, JDL/WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1315&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1315_.HTM |