HI SB1313 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1313
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires both chambers of the legislature to establish rules for livestreaming public hearings and informational briefings at the state capitol to the public through audiovisual technology.
Title
Relating To The Legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee on TEC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-13-19 3:21PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-19 3:10PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 3:10PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1313 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1313&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1313_.HTM |