HI SB131 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of psychology to establish a pilot program to grant prescriptive authority to qualified psychologist applicants in counties with a population of less than one hundred thousand persons. Repeals on 8/31/2026.
Title
Relating To Psychologists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/CPN, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB131 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=131&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB131_.HTM |