HI SB1304 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-26 - (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-26 - (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for payment of interest due on Title XII loans from the Employment and Training (E&T) Fund. Authorizes the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations director to increase the E&T assessment in increments of .01 per cent retroactive to January 1, 2011.
Title
Employment Security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1077 (Same As) 2011-02-24 - (H) Act 002, on 2/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1304 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1304_.htm |