HI SB1302 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1302

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires corporations to include the income of all foreign subsidiaries to the State. Applies the State's apportionment formula to determine the share of reported profits subject to the appropriate tax. Effective 1/1/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tax Haven Abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee on CPN deferred the measure.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 10:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to CPN/JDC, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB441 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1302 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback