HI SB130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB130
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the judiciary to purchase civil legal services for low-income and moderate-income persons. (SB130 HD1)
Title
Relating To Civil Legal Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:20PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 3:16PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:05PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Kim, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Thielen. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 726). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2176) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1472), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 51) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 700) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 90) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB130 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
HB161 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB161 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2