HI SB1298 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1298

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the department of transportation for the purpose of reopening Highway 132, also known as Kapoho Road.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-13SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 271) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to TRS, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1298 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback