HI SB1294 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1294
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 3:40PM; Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 3:40PM; Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to reinstate the basic package of diagnostic, preventive, and restorative dental benefits to adult medicaid enrollees. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Medicaid Benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 3:40PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 905). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Acasio, Fevella. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Tam Co-Chairs; Nakamura, Ward. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 527). |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1854-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 2:45PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1272-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 99) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3013) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2036) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB866 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1294 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HMS, WAM.
SB1294 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HMS, WAM.