HI SB1289 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1289

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the issuance of building permits beginning on January 1, 2022, for new single-family dwellings, except for households with one hundred per cent or less of the area median income, that are part of a development of twenty or more dwellings and do not include a rooftop solar energy generation system, unless a variance is granted. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Rooftop Solar Installation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
2020-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
2020-03-13HouseReported from EEP/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1075-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-03-12HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Hashimoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-03-12HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2020-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HSG on Thursday, 03-12-20 10:45AM in House conference room 423.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to EEP/HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 80) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3178) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2020-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2020-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EET/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 649) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, J.Keohokalole ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EET/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 3:15PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to EET/HOU, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1289 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback