HI SB1287 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1287

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes objectives and policies and implementation guidelines for planning for the lei of green in the Hawaii State Planning Act. Appropriates funds for costs associated with researching, compiling, and submitting the status report on the lei of green policy, including (1.0) FTE temporary planner position within the Office of Planning. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Planning.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LMG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 435) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-02-01SenateRe-Referred to WTL, WAM.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WTL/HOU, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1314 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1287 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback