HI SB1286 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 164, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 164, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the scope of the private trade, vocational, and technical school licensure program within the department of education. Establishes a licensing fee to ensure the sustainability of the licensure program. Establishes a license renewal process and fee. Creates the private trade, vocational, and technical school licensure special fund. Appropriates moneys for one full-time equivalent position within the department of education to administer licensing. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Private Trade, Vocational, And Technical Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 164, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 164, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 97) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 97). |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Takumi, Lowen, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Baker, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:45PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Baker, K. Kahele Co-Chairs; Dela Cruz. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Takumi, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ohno, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 580). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1756), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-05-17 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1355) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:05PM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-17. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2017-03-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:02PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 377) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EDU/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-09-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Riviere. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB494 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2