HI SB1282 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1282

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires licensed used motor vehicle part dealers to obtain a written statement by a seller of a catalytic converter that the seller has the lawful right to sell and dispose of the catalytic converter. Requires certain sellers of a catalytic converter to present a receipt or notarized declaration regarding the catalytic converter in certain circumstances. Prohibits a licensed used motor vehicle part dealer from purchasing a catalytic converter with no receipt or notarized declaration and to report the attempted sale to the police. Establishes the offense of theft of catalytic converter as a class C felony. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Catalytic Converters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 10:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to CPN, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1282 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback