HI SB1281 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1281
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to release to beneficiaries of the Hawaiian Homes Commission Act, 1920, monthly reports that contain certain information on leases and fiscal matters. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2508) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN, WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1281 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Re-Referred to HWN, WAM/JDC.