HI SB1278 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1278
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a county with a population greater than 500,000 to extend the county surcharge on state tax to December 31, 2047. Requires a county that uses the surcharge on state tax for a mass transit project to submit quarterly progress reports to the legislature. Permits counties to use the surcharge on state tax for infrastructure for affordable housing and transit-oriented development. Authorizes the legislature to hold revenues collected from the surcharge on state tax for county use by concurrent resolution. Deducts twenty-five per cent of the amount from the gross proceeds of a county's surcharge on state tax for costs associated with handling the assessment, collection, and disposition of the county surcharge on state tax, and the construction of transit-oriented development and other related transportation projects.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRE/HOU/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1278 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to TRE/HOU/PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1278&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1278_.HTM |