HI SB1277 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1277
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the minutes at public agency meetings to be kept by written or recorded by analog or digital means. If the minutes are recorded, requires that a written summary accompany minutes, and that the written summary include any significant actions taken by the board, including motions and votes made by the board. Requires recorded minutes to be available within ten days after the board meeting, with certain exceptions. Requires the board to maintain reasonable care of any original or duplicate recordings of minutes that are recorded by analog or digital means. Takes effect on July 1, 2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Public Agency Meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 375) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 673) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 136) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Tokuda. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDL. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1277 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Analog or Digital Recordings
Availability and Maintenance of Recorded Minutes
Minutes
Public Agency Meetings
Written Summaries
Availability and Maintenance of Recorded Minutes
Minutes
Public Agency Meetings
Written Summaries