HI SB1275 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1275

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each state government branch, and authorizes each county, to establish a shared leave program for state employees. Precludes state government branches and applicable counties from prohibiting leave sharing between employees of different departments or bargaining units because of administrative infeasibility. Allows a public employee to designate beneficiaries to the employee's unpaid vacation allowance and wages through a statement that is not verified or written. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-16HouseThe committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 399) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 915) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-03-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 483) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1275 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback