HI SB1266 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1266

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a food manufacturer tax credit. Defines "qualified taxpayers" as manufacturers that produce valued-added products using local crops. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2023-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1266 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
HB947 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback