HI SB1262 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a health care provider to disclose to patients adverse events relating to their medical treatment. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Mandatory Disclosure of Adverse Events
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Nishihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-13-09 2:40pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 3:00pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HTH, JGO. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |