HI SB1258 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the Board of Land and Natural Resources (Board) to lease any existing state boating facility in its entirety, and fast lands and submerged lands within any existing state boating facility, by public auction, request for proposals, or direct negotiation for private development, management, and operation after making a finding that the lessee has met certain community involvement requirements. Clarifies that legislative approval is not required to award a lease. Repeals fast lands and submerged lands lease requirements specific to Ala Wai Boat Harbor. Takes effect on 12/31/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Boating Facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 424) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki, K. Rhoads, Ruderman . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from WTL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 892) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateRe-Referred to WTL/WAM.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1032 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1378).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback