HI SB1256 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a fee on sugar-sweetened beverages. Establishes the obesity and chronic disease prevention special fund and the Hawaii interagency obesity prevention council to support obesity prevention programs. Makes an appropriation from the obesity and chronic disease prevention special fund to the department of health.
Title
Obesity Prevention; Sugar-Sweetened Beverage Fee; Hawaii Interagency Obesity Prevention Council; Obesity and Chronic Disease Prevention Special Fund; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-18-15 1:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 1:35PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, JDL/WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1439 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1256&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB1256_.HTM |