HI SB1256 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 273, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1379).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 273, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1379).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $400,000 for operations, personnel costs, and the purchase of equipment required to support the Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems' activities. (CD1)
Title
Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act 273, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1379). |
2013-07-09 | House | Act 273, on 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1379). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 158) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 158). |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Tsuji, Nishimoto, Takai, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, English, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:15PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 9:15AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kidani discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Choy, Tsuji, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Takai, Fale. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); English, Kidani, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 627). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1589) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from HED/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1035) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Ohno, Takumi, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Takai. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED/EDB on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HED/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 364) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 767) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, English, L. Thielen, Tokuda. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 174) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |