HI SB1249 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1249
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Technology Innovation Corporation, a corporation attached to the High Technology Development Corporation, to assist in attracting high technology development opportunities to the State. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Technology Innovation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1249 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.