HI SB1242 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1242

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a trauma-informed care task force within the department of health to make recommendations of trauma-informed care in the State. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Trauma-informed Care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 391) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 889) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-03-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-17SenateReported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 278) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HTH, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1322 (Same As)
SB1242 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback