HI SB1240 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to submit proposed legislation to the legislature by the 2019 regular session including a definition of "sustainable", a policy for sustainable collection practices of near shore aquatic life, a process for determining limits on collection practices of near shore aquatic life, and any additional resources required by the department. Prohibits issuance of new aquarium permits. Prohibits transfer of current permits subject to certain provisions. Prohibits renewal of permits that have not been renewed for five or more years. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Aquatic Life.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1274). |
2017-07-11 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1274). |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-17 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-06-23 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Hashem, Ito, Kong, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Say, Takayama, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward, Yamashita voting no (14) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 158) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 158). |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Cullen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 688). |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; L. Thielen. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Holt, Matsumoto, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Ito, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Tupola voting no (9) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1731), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Ito, Matsumoto, Morikawa, Onishi, Oshiro, Say, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3). |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1217) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, LoPresti; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Takayama, Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 369) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 844) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-02-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 530) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads K., Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Thielen L.. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDL. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |