HI SB1224 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1224
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide a framework that supports consistent land use planning and development across the University of Hawaii System and allows project partnerships with qualified persons.
Title
Relating To University Districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE/WTL, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1070 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1224 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
SB1224 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1224&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1224_.HTM |