HI SB1220 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the suspension and expulsion of children participating in the Executive Office on Early Learning Public Prekindergarten Program. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Early Childhood Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 405) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Rhoads). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from EDU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 827) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to EDU/HMS.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB994 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback