HI SB1216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Defense to recoup operating costs when the Adjutant General permits temporary facility use of department facilities to the public. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Department Of Defense Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1216 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB990 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 076, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
HB990 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 076, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).