HI SB1197 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1197
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Vice President for Budget and Finance and Chief Financial Officer of the University of Hawaii as the Chief Procurement Officer for the University and appropriates funds for the transition. Appropriates general obligation bond funds to University of Hawaii, Systemwide Support (UOH900) to renew, improve, and modernize facilities. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 384) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:20AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, JDC. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE/GVO, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB230 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1197 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17
SB1197 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Chief Procurement Officer
GO Bonds
UH
Vice President for Budget and Finance and Chief Financial Officer
Chief Procurement Officer
GO Bonds
UH
Vice President for Budget and Finance and Chief Financial Officer