HI SB1194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1194
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts gross income from agricultural commodities sold directly to consumers from the general excise tax up to a limit of $50,000 per year. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1194 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.