HI SB1184 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a definition for confidential witness. Allows factual matters obtained in the course of investigation, conciliation, and litigation of complaints to be used as evidence in litigation of complaints filed with the commission. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Confidential Witness; Civil Rights Commission Investigations
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 28 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 331) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-09 9:00am in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |