HI SB1171 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 157, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 157, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Identifies certain circumstances under which the State has a compelling interest in the disclosure, use, and production of de-identified protected health information under the Health Care Privacy Harmonization Act; provided that the information has been de-identified pursuant to title 45 Code of Federal Regulations part 164. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Health Care Privacy Harmonization Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 157, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2017-07-11 | House | Act 157, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 7). |
2017-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 508). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1565) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott. |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1159), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 355) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1404 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
De-identified Protected Health Information
Disclosures, Uses, and Production
Health Care Privacy Harmonization Act
Disclosures, Uses, and Production
Health Care Privacy Harmonization Act