HI SB1167 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a new Agricultural Enterprise Program within the Department of Agriculture to plan, design, construct, operate, manage, maintain, repair, demolish, and remove infrastructure on any lands under the jurisdiction of the Department, to support and promote agriculture. Establishes the Agricultural Enterprise Special Fund. Makes an appropriation. (SB1167 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Enterprises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-24 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 960). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Gabbard added as Chair. Senator Dela Cruz discharged as Chair. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Holt Co-Chairs; Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Okimoto. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 687). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2128), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nishimoto, Todd. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1624) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi, Okimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-20-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 382) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-19 9:55AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB940 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1167 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 960).
SB1167 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 960).