HI SB1166 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 171, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 171, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that preparation, burial, or cremation of a corpse in a manner consistent with traditional Hawaiian cultural customs and practices shall not constitute the offense of abuse of a corpse. (SB1166 HD2)
Title
Abuse of a Corpse; Traditional Hawaiian Cultural Customs and Practices
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Act 171, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272). |
2015-07-02 | House | Act 171, on 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 650). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628). |
2015-04-21 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Lowen added as Conferee. Representative Say discharged as Conferee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-15. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-22-15. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Say, Pouha. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Deferred until 04-16-15. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 467). |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday 04-10-15. |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, Nakashima. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-18-15 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 325) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-05-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 339) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1297 (Same As) 2015-04-22 - Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628).