HI SB1164 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1164

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adds the promotion of civics learning in the K-12 curriculum to the education objective and policies for sociocultural advancement. Adds the development of resources and programs for civic education in the K-12 curriculum as a priority guideline to promote quality education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Civic Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-29SenateRe-Referred to EDU, JDC.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to EDU/EET, JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1164 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - Re-Referred to EDU, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback