HI SB1159 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Medical Marijuana Administration in DOH to administer marijuana dispensary licensing and regulation, and patient registration. Limits each location used to cultivate marijuana to use by five qualifying patients. Authorizes primary caregivers to cultivate marijuana for qualifying patients until December 31, 2020. Extends civil service exemptions. Extends interim rulemaking authority. Authorizes an alternate medical marijuana dispensary tracking system for use when the DOH computer tracking system in nonfunctional and requires DOH to report to the legislative oversight working group. Adds considerations for establishing marijuana testing standards and selecting additional dispensary licensees. Allows DOH to consider whether existing dispensary licensees shall be allowed to increase plant count, increase the number of production centers, or increase the number of retail dispensing locations. Requires retention of video security recordings of production centers and dispensaries for not less than 45 days. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-14-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1159 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1488 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Act 041, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
HB1488 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Act 041, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
Subjects
Alternate Tracking System
Computer Tracking System
DOH
Established
Medical Marijuana Dispensaries
Office of Medical Marijuana Administration
Qualifying Patients
Testing Standards
Computer Tracking System
DOH
Established
Medical Marijuana Dispensaries
Office of Medical Marijuana Administration
Qualifying Patients
Testing Standards